"JavaScript is a standard programming language that is included to provide interactive features, Kindly enable Javascript in your browser. For details visit help page"
भारत सरकार
GOVERNMENT OF INDIA
संचार मंत्रालय
Ministry of Communications
Skip to main content
Search form
Search
A
+
A
A
-
A
A
Language
हिन्दी
Logo
दूरसंचार विभाग
Department of Telecommunications
Menu
Home
About Us
Interact with the Minister
Cabinet Minister
Minister of State
List of Former Ministers
Chairman’s Desk
Profile
Vision & Mission
Functions of DoT
Organisations & Units
Wings & Divisions
Statutory Bodies
TDSAT
TRAI
Attached Offices
Director General Telecom
TEC
USOF
CGCA
Subordinate Offices
Wireless Monitoring Organisation
NCCS
Field Offices
LSA
CCA
Autonomous Bodies
CDOT
Training Institutes
NTIPRIT
NICF
Public Sector Undertakings
BSNL
MTNL
BBNL
TCIL
ITI
Citizen Charter
Telecom at a Glance
Directory
Organizational Structure
Acts
Telecom Policies
National Telecom Policy, 1994
New Telecom Policy, 1999
Addendum to NTP,1999
Broadband policy, 2004
Amendment to Broadband Policy, 2004
National Telecom Policy 2012
National Digital Communications Policy-2018
National Broadband Mission
DoT PMA/PMI Policy
Telecom & Spectrum Licensing
Access Services
Carrier Services
Data Services
Satellite Services
Unified License
Licensing Finance
LFA
LFP
WPC and Spectrum Management
Wireless Planning & Finance
Investment Promotion
PLI Scheme
DCIS
PP-Preference to Make in India
Invest India
Telecom Reforms
Telecom Reforms Brochure
SatCom Reforms
Wireless Licensing Reforms
Telecom Reforms VoL I
Telecom Reforms VoL II
Telecom Reforms 2021
Quantum Key Distribution
DoT Portals
BharatNet Dashboard
SancharSaathi
MTCTE Portal
GatiShakti Sanchar Portal
PM-WANI Portal
USOF Portal
DoT Dashboard
Telecom PLI Scheme
Saras Portal
Saral Sanchar
Tarang Sanchar
DoT Pension Portal
Useful Link
Rajya Sabha
Lok Sabha
Right to Information
PPP MI
DCIS
Public Awareness Campaign
Useful Websites
Bharat Digicom Portal
MSTC India
Media
e-Gazette
Photo Gallery
Press Release
Video Spots
Social Media
Side menu
Inner page banner
Content
Home
/
Telemarketing
telemarketing
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
The appointment of Sh.Saurabh Kumar,Deptt. of Revenue, Ministry of Finance as APS is as the discretion of and coterminous with the tenure of MOS&C&IT
Language
English
Read more
about The appointment of Sh.Saurabh Kumar,Deptt. of Revenue, Ministry of Finance as APS is as the discretion of and coterminous with the tenure of MOS&C&IT
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
Shri. Parvindra Kumar ,anon official is appointed as Hindi Stenographer personnel staff of MOC&IT
Language
English
Read more
about Shri. Parvindra Kumar ,anon official is appointed as Hindi Stenographer personnel staff of MOC&IT
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
consequent inter cadre transfer and nomination of this deptt. of SH.M.R.Kandle,Assistant can be taken in the strength of DOT w.e.forenoon 2-10-2014.
Language
English
Read more
about consequent inter cadre transfer and nomination of this deptt. of SH.M.R.Kandle,Assistant can be taken in the strength of DOT w.e.forenoon 2-10-2014.
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
Sh.Sita Ram Non official is appointed as attendant in the personal staff of cabinet minister w.e.f.27.5.2014
Language
English
Read more
about Sh.Sita Ram Non official is appointed as attendant in the personal staff of cabinet minister w.e.f.27.5.2014
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
Sh.Sanjeev Kumar is a non official staff as APS of Cabinet minister w.e.f.10.11.2014
Language
English
Read more
about Sh.Sanjeev Kumar is a non official staff as APS of Cabinet minister w.e.f.10.11.2014
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
Sh.Ajay Kumar anon official is appointed as LDC in the personal staff of cabinet minister in the forenoon 27.05.2014
Language
English
Read more
about Sh.Ajay Kumar anon official is appointed as LDC in the personal staff of cabinet minister in the forenoon 27.05.2014
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
Shri. MUkesh Kumar Kashyap,US is posted to vigilance wing,DoT with immediate effect vice sh.S.D.M.Chawla retired on supernuation
Language
English
Read more
about Shri. MUkesh Kumar Kashyap,US is posted to vigilance wing,DoT with immediate effect vice sh.S.D.M.Chawla retired on supernuation
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
Regarding leave of Sh.R.K.Meena,Director(PG)
Language
English
Read more
about Regarding leave of Sh.R.K.Meena,Director(PG)
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
order no 30.52/2014-Admin1
Language
English
Read more
about order no 30.52/2014-Admin1
ADMIN on 09.01.2016
Shri.Davinder Kumar ,SO,is relieved stands from his duties w.e.f. 13.10.2014 to join on promotion of under Secretary.
Language
English
Read more
about Shri.Davinder Kumar ,SO,is relieved stands from his duties w.e.f. 13.10.2014 to join on promotion of under Secretary.
Pages
« first
‹ previous
…
2524
2525
2526
2527
2528
2529
2530
2531
2532
…
next ›
last »
Your browser does not support JavaScript!